1. This site uses cookies. By continuing to use this site, you are agreeing to our use of cookies. Learn More.
  2. Hi Guest, welcome to the TES Community!

    Connect with like-minded professionals and have your say on the issues that matter to you.

    Don't forget to look at the how to guide.

    Dismiss Notice
  3. The Teacher Q&A will be closing soon.

    If you have any information that you would like to keep or refer to in the future please can you copy and paste the information to a format suitable for you to save or take screen shots of the questions and responses you are interested in.

    Don’t forget you can still use the rest of the forums on theTes Community to post questions and get the advice, help and support you require from your peers for all your teaching needs.

    Dismiss Notice

Edexcel C1 Examiners Report: 25 x 102

Discussion in 'Mathematics' started by Lee Fields, Aug 25, 2011.

  1. Lee Fields

    Lee Fields New commenter

    In the June 2011 C1 paper Question 9 (a) was:
    Calculate the sum of all the even numbers from 2 to 100 inclusive,

    2 + 4 + 6 + ...... + 100
    The Examiners' Report commented :
    "... Calculating 25 x 102 correctly, caused
    problems for many."

    So without a calculator, many A level students cannot work out 25 x 102 !
    The Educational Commissars were asleep here, putting that appalling fact in the public domain!
     
  2. Karvol

    Karvol Occasional commenter

    Depends how you interpret the statement. I would have interpreted it as not many students were able to figure out that the sum is "25 x 102".
    I don't teach A levels, so I could be wrong. ( I certainly hope not though! Far too scary a thought. )
     
  3. Maths_Mike

    Maths_Mike New commenter

    Afraid I would definitly think this means the calculation was the problem.
    the formula 0.5n(a+l) is simple enough
     
  4. Please sir! I know! 25 x 102 is 2550
    I can well imagine some of my students having problems with that.

     
  5. Nah you've got it wrong .... everyone knows (well some of my year 11 know) that the way to do it is:

    2 x 102 = 204
    5 x 102 = 610

    610 + 204 = 814
     

Share This Page